+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (02/11/2020)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2020)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary