+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/03/2014)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (03/25/2014)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/12/2014)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2014)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor