+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/13/2014)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2014)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services