+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the House:
- House passed as amended in concurrence
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016)
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
On June 12, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016)
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/14/2016)
- Committee recommends passage
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2016)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2016)
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs