+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (02/06/2020)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2020)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services