+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/04/2013)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2013)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/05/2013)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2013)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor