+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/06/2018)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/07/2018)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2018)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (01/23/2018)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor