+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/03/2018)
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage as amended
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance