+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Small Business
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/14/2016)
- Committee recommends passage
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2016)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing (02/03/2016)
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce