+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
- Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2015)
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/12/2015)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2015)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (02/24/2015)
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary