+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2017)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2017)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary