+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/29/2015)
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/05/2015)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (02/25/2015)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2015)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government