+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017)
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services