+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2013)
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (02/26/2013)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2013)
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary