+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2015)
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary