+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2013)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/15/2013)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2013)
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2013)
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture