+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013)
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2013)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended
On June 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/15/2013)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2013)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2013)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor