+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/02/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/01/2013)
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance