+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/11/2014)
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2014)
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2014)
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2014)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary