+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House read and passed
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (03/20/2018)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/15/2018)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Labor