+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/29/2014)
- Committee recommends passage
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/16/2014)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2014)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.