+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary