+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2017)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2017)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2017)
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017)
- Committee transferred to House Veterans Affairs
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance