+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (05/02/2013)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013)
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs