+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2015)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2015)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2015)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources