+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/23/2013)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2013)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (03/06/2013)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2013)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.