+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014)
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations