+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 4, 2014 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2014)
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2014)
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014)
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor