+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 5, 2018 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
On June 18, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 1, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (05/31/2018)
- Committee transferred to House Finance
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration