+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 8, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for reconsideration (06/16/2016)
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 12, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016)
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2016)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.