+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 2, 2022 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 24, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022)
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2022)
On June 17, 2022 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2022)
On June 11, 2022 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2022)
- Proposed Substitute
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2022)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor