+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2016 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016)
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2016)
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/24/2016)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2016)
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2016)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources