+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/10/2018)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/08/2018)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2018)
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government