+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016)
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016)
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 4, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2016)
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance