+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014)
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2014)
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2014)
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2014)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor