+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/30/2018)
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/24/2018)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary