+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 23, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration
- Meeting postponed (06/23/2018)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary