+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/07/2014)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2014)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/10/2014)
- Committee recommends passage
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2014)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary