+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2016)
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/27/2016)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/13/2016)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary