+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 2, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014)
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2014)
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2014)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/15/2014)
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations