+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/26/2022)
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/05/2022)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations