+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 4, 2018 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 26, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2018)
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor