+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/10/2014)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2014)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/03/2014)
- Committee recommends passage
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (03/25/2014)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor