+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/11/2014)
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2014)
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/01/2014)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/17/2014)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2014)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government