+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/29/2014)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2014)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/01/2014)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor