+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On August 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2016)
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (05/17/2016)
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor