+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 2, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2014)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2014)
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2014)
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2014)
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor