+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/08/2014)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance