+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2014)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/22/2014)
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance