+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/24/2018)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Committee transferred to House Corporations
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance